MN SF753 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - HF substituted on General Orders HF916
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - HF substituted on General Orders HF916
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crow Wing county auditor-treasurer and recorder appointive process authorization
Title
Crow Wing county auditor-treasurer and recorder appointive process authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | HF substituted on General Orders HF916 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Rules and Administration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF916 (Similar To) 2015-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 38 05/14/15