MN SF746 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adult children of deceased patient definition of patient addition
Title
Adult children of deceased patient definition of patient addition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Author added Nienow |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF792 (Similar To) 2015-04-07 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance