MN SF708 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Bakk
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ranked-choice voting political subdivisions implementation prohibition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ranked-choice voting political subdivisions implementation prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06SenateAuthor added Bakk
2021-03-11SenateAuthor added Osmek
2021-02-08SenateReferred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2021-02-08SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2505 (Similar To) 2021-04-09 - Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback