MN SF702 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF809
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF809
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State-sponsored health programs abortion funding limitations
Title
State-sponsored health programs abortion funding limitations
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. Caroline Ruud [R] |
Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF809 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF809 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Secretary of State Chapter 31