MN SF699 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-11 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Doula services medical assistance (MA) coverage requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Doula services medical assistance (MA) coverage requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-11SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
2013-03-05SenateAuthor added Carlson
2013-02-25SenateAuthor added Kiffmeyer
2013-02-21SenateReferred to Health, Human Services and Housing
2013-02-21SenateIntroduction and first reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback