MN SF671 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Home health services and home care nursing services payment rates modifications
Title
Home health services and home care nursing services payment rates modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Aric Putnam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Author added Putnam |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Aging and Long-Term Care Policy |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF446 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Author added Albright