MN SF668 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Author added Hoffman
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Author added Hoffman
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health department resident assessment modifications; elderly waiver program reform and appropriation
Title
Health department resident assessment modifications; elderly waiver program reform and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] | Sen. Anthony Lourey [D] |
Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Aging and Long-Term Care Policy |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF823 (Similar To) 2017-03-31 - Author added Heintzeman.