MN SF656 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Author added Jasinski
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Author added Jasinski
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Same day drivers licenses and identification cards issuance
Title
Same day drivers licenses and identification cards issuance
Sponsors
Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] | Sen. Gene Dornink [R] | Sen. Julia Coleman [R] |
Sen. John Jasinski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Author added Jasinski |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Authors added Dornink; Coleman |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Author added Eken |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF763 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy