MN SF620 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Author added Mann
Pending: Senate Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Pilot program to improve educational outcomes and accountability establishment and appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pilot program to improve educational outcomes and accountability establishment and appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-27SenateAuthor added Mann
2023-02-16SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Education Finance
2023-01-23SenateReferred to Education Policy
2023-01-23SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF345 (Similar To) 2023-03-08 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback