MN SF611 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Author added McEwen
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State Canvassing Board declaration of the candidates duly elected who received the highest number of votes for each federal and state offices requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Canvassing Board declaration of the candidates duly elected who received the highest number of votes for each federal and state offices requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-06SenateAuthor added McEwen
2023-01-26SenateSecond reading
2023-01-26SenateComm report: To pass
2023-01-23SenateReferred to Elections
2023-01-23SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF95 (Similar To) 2023-01-30 - Second reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback