MN SF592 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement personnel salary increases authorization and appropriation
Title
Law enforcement personnel salary increases authorization and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] | Sen. Gary Dahms [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Sen. Greg Clausen [D] |
Sen. Karla Bigham [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Authors added Clausen; Bigham |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Author added Howe |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF401 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Author added Boe