MN SF578 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF792
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF792
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Townhouse definition modification
Title
Townhouse definition modification
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Erik Simonson [D] |
Sen. David Senjem [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF792 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF792 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Secretary of State Chapter 20 05/02/17