MN SF573 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Elderly waiver language recodification and technical changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elderly waiver language recodification and technical changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-19 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22 Secretary of State, Filed
2019-05-22 Governor approval
2019-05-22 Secretary of State Chapter 54
2019-05-22 Governor's action Approval
2019-05-22 Presented to Governor
2019-05-20SenateReturned from House
2019-05-19HouseBill was passed
2019-05-19HouseThird reading
2019-05-17HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 19, 2019
2019-05-10HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 14, 2019
2019-03-11HouseSecond reading
2019-03-11HouseBills identical, SF substituted on General Register
2019-03-11HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF267
2019-03-11HouseReceived from Senate
2019-03-04SenateThird reading Passed
2019-03-04SenateSpecial Order
2019-02-07SenateSecond reading
2019-02-07SenateComm report: To pass
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Family Care and Aging
2019-01-28SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF267 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - HF indefinitely postponed

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback