MN SF561 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-16 - Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF702
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-16 - Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF702
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Juvenile justice system decision points study requirement
Title
Juvenile justice system decision points study requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Higgins [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Mee Moua [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-16 | Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF702 | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2009-05-08 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-05-08 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-03-09 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2009-02-09 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Judiciary |