MN SF556 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - General Orders: Stricken and returned to author
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - General Orders: Stricken and returned to author
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Off-road recreational vehicle odometers tampering prohibition
Title
Off-road recreational vehicle odometers tampering prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Katie Sieben [D] | Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Matt Schmit [D] | Sen. David Tomassoni [I] |
Sen. Charles Wiger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and returned to author |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Energy |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |