MN SF506 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Secretary of State Chapter 283 05/07/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Secretary of State Chapter 283 05/07/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conciliation court civil claim limit increase
Title
Conciliation court civil claim limit increase
Sponsors
Sen. Julianne Ortman [R] | Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Rep. Ron Shimanski [R] |
Rep. Steve Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - House - Repassage, as amended by Conference Committee (Y: 73 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 77 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 77 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Secretary of State Chapter 283 05/07/12 | |
2012-05-08 | Governor's action Approval 05/07/12 | |
2012-05-03 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 73-54 |
2012-05-03 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2012-05-03 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2012-05-03 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-05-03 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2012-05-03 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Third reading vote: 66-0 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-04-24 | House | House conferees Shimanski, Mazorol, and Kath. |
2012-04-24 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2012-04-24 | House | Senate conferees Ortman, Limmer, Metzen |
2012-04-24 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-04-24 | Senate | House conferees Shimanski; Mazorol; Kath |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Senate conferees Ortman; Limmer; Metzen |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2012-04-23 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2012-04-20 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 77-49 |
2012-04-20 | House | Third reading as amended |
2012-04-20 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2012-04-20 | House | Amended |
2012-04-19 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Friday, April 20, 2012 |
2012-04-18 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Thursday, April 19, 2012 |
2012-04-17 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Wednesday, April 18, 2012 |
2012-04-16 | House | House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar Tuesday, April 17, 2012 |
2012-03-29 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2011-05-16 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2011-05-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Calendar: Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2011-05-14 | Senate | General Orders: To pass as amended |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2011-04-18 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2011-04-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2011-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2011-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |