MN SF504 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Former and current military members expedited and temporary health licensing establishment
Title
Former and current military members expedited and temporary health licensing establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF506 (Similar To) 2015-04-07 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance