MN SF5 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF30, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF30, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Catalytic converter purchase requirements establishment and appropriation
Title
Catalytic converter purchase requirements establishment and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. John Marty [D] | Sen. Zaynab Mohamed [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Omar Fateh [D] |
Sen. Ronald Latz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF30, SF indefinitely postponed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Author added Latz |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF30 (Similar To) 2023-03-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 15