MN SF5 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety peer support activity admissibility of statements and critical incident stress management services limitations; certain data classification
Title
Public safety peer support activity admissibility of statements and critical incident stress management services limitations; certain data classification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2020-06-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Taken from table |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Author added Bigham |
2020-06-12 | Senate | By Motion, Laid on Table |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |