MN SF5 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus higher education bill
Title
Omnibus higher education bill
Sponsors
Sen. Terri Bonoff [D] | Sen. David Senjem [R] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. Thomas Bakk [I] |
Sen. David Tomassoni [I] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-17 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 71 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-17 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 70 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-17 - House - House: Refuse to Adopt (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - House: Passage (Y: 72 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House: Re-Referral (Y: 56 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 68 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-17 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 71 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-17 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 70 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-17 - House - House: Refuse to Adopt (Y: 59 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - House: Passage (Y: 72 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House: Re-Referral (Y: 56 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 68 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2015-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2015-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 69 | |
2015-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2015-05-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2015-05-17 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 71-57 |
2015-05-17 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2015-05-17 | House | House adopted conference committee report question recurred |
2015-05-17 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 59-69 |
2015-05-17 | House | Motion to return bill to conference committee |
2015-05-17 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2015-05-17 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2015-05-17 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 57-8 |
2015-05-17 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Third reading vote: 57-8 |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2015-04-30 | Senate | House conferees Nornes; O'Neill; Gruenhagen; Christensen; Pelowski |
2015-04-29 | House | House conferees Nornes, O'Neill, Gruenhagen, Christensen, and Pelowski. |
2015-04-29 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2015-04-29 | House | Senate conferees Bonoff; Clausen; Eken; Dziedzic; Miller |
2015-04-29 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate conferees Bonoff; Clausen; Eken; Dziedzic; Miller |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2015-04-27 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 72-55 |
2015-04-27 | House | House rule 2.05, member excused from voting Mariani |
2015-04-27 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 56-68 |
2015-04-27 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2015-04-27 | House | Third reading as amended |
2015-04-27 | House | House rule 4.03, Ways and Means budget certification point of order ruled well taken |
2015-04-27 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken multiple points of order, pages 3366, 3367, 3368, 3369 |
2015-04-27 | House | Amended |
2015-04-24 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 27, 2015 |
2015-04-23 | House | Second reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2015-04-22 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF845 |
2015-04-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 42-21 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Higher Education and Workforce Development |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF551 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Author added Mahoney.