MN SF492 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 20 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety commissioner uniform administrative citation creation requirement; local units of government administrative fines imposition authority for traffic offenses and peace officer issuance restriction; mini truck use and operation regulation
Title
Public safety commissioner uniform administrative citation creation requirement; local units of government administrative fines imposition authority for traffic offenses and peace officer issuance restriction; mini truck use and operation regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Governor's action Approval | |
2009-05-21 | Governor approval | |
2009-05-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2009-05-20 | Presentment date | |
2009-05-18 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by Conference | |
2009-05-18 | House: Third reading as amended by Conference | |
2009-05-18 | House: Motion prevailed | |
2009-05-18 | House: Motion to adopt conference committee report | |
2009-05-18 | House: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2009-05-18 | House: Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed | |
2009-05-18 | Senate: House adopted SCC report and repassed bill | |
2009-05-18 | Senate: Third reading | |
2009-05-18 | Senate: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2009-05-18 | Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill | |
2009-05-17 | Senate: House conferees Sailer; Hosch; Scalze; Reinert; Cornish | |
2009-05-16 | House: House conferees Sailer, Hosch, Scalze, Reinert, Cornish | |
2009-05-16 | House: House accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed | |
2009-05-16 | House: Senate conferees Skogen, Clark, Ingebrigtsen, Moua, Foley | |
2009-05-16 | House: Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested | |
2009-05-16 | Senate: Senate conferees Skogen; Clark; Ingebrigtsen; Moua; Foley | |
2009-05-16 | Senate: Reconsidered To add conferees | |
2009-05-16 | Senate: Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested | |
2009-05-16 | Senate: Returned from House with amendment | |
2009-05-16 | Senate: Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested | |
2009-05-15 | House: Bill was passed as amended | |
2009-05-15 | House: Third reading as amended | |
2009-05-15 | House: Amended | |
2009-05-08 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2009-05-05 | House: Second reading | |
2009-05-05 | House: Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register | |
2009-05-04 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF571 | |
2009-05-04 | House: Received from Senate | |
2009-05-04 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2009-04-30 | Senate: Author added Erickson Ropes | |
2009-03-16 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-03-16 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2009-02-09 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Transportation |