MN SF487 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Senate: Author added Robling
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Senate: Author added Robling
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Office of early learning creation
Title
Office of early learning creation
Sponsors
Sen. Terri Bonoff [D] | Sen. Tarryl Clark [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Michel [R] | Sen. Claire Robling [R] |
Sen. Tom Saxhaug [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Senate: Author added Robling | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2010-03-18 | Senate: Withdrawn and re-referred to State and Local Government Operations and Oversight | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Clark | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Chief author added Michel | |
2009-03-16 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2009-03-05 | Senate: Withdrawn and re-referred to State and Local Government Operations and Oversight | |
2009-02-05 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-02-05 | Senate: Referred to Education |