MN SF4861 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
340B covered entities reporting requirements modifications and reports to the legislature requirement
Title
340B covered entities reporting requirements modifications and reports to the legislature requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4755 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy