MN SF4860 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vital record provisions modifications
Title
Vital record provisions modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4857 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law