MN SF485 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-13 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-13 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Competency-based education plan school district or charter school adoption authorization
Title
Competency-based education plan school district or charter school adoption authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Charles Wiger [D] | Sen. Paul T. Anderson [R] | Sen. Greg Clausen [D] |
Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-13 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2190 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Author added Lee