MN SF4837 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oversight of health maintenance organization transactions by the commissioner of health authorization
Title
Oversight of health maintenance organization transactions by the commissioner of health authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Author added Boldon |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4853 (Similar To) 2024-04-09 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger