MN SF482 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Secretary of State Chapter 56 05/17/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Secretary of State Chapter 56 05/17/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health licensing title protection and grounds for disciplinary action clarification and technical changes
Title
Health licensing title protection and grounds for disciplinary action clarification and technical changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Secretary of State Chapter 56 05/17/17 | |
2017-05-18 | Governor's action Approval 05/17/17 | |
2017-05-15 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Returned from House |
2017-05-11 | House | Bill was passed vote: 127-0 |
2017-05-11 | House | Third reading |
2017-05-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 11, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Second reading |
2017-05-09 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2017-05-08 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF643 |
2017-05-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 61-0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF643 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - HF indefinitely postponed