MN SF480 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Author added Bigham
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Parental contribution fees for services for children with disabilities elimination

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental contribution fees for services for children with disabilities elimination

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18SenateAuthor added Bigham
2019-01-31SenateAuthors added Hoffman; Clausen
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
2019-01-24SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF748 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Authors added Xiong, J. and Daniels

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback