MN SF474 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State lottery prize winner privacy authorization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State lottery prize winner privacy authorization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateSecond reading
2019-03-18SenateComm report: To pass
2019-03-07SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-02-04SenateAuthor added Ruud
2019-01-28SenateAuthor added Rest
2019-01-24SenateReferred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2019-01-24SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2283 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback