MN SF4719 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Blue Line light rail transit extension antidisplacement community prosperity program establishment and appropriation; antidisplacement programing administration board establishment
Title
Blue Line light rail transit extension antidisplacement community prosperity program establishment and appropriation; antidisplacement programing administration board establishment
Sponsors
Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Susan Pha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Author added Pha |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4683 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy