MN SF47 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan council gubernatorial appointees local approval requirement; local governments removal of council member procedures authorization
Title
Metropolitan council gubernatorial appointees local approval requirement; local governments removal of council member procedures authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Author added Wiger |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |