MN SF4593 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Author added Pha
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-15 - Author added Pha
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Wage theft prevention and use of responsible contractors when the Minnesota Finance Agency provides financial assistance for development of multiunit residential housing requirement
Title
Wage theft prevention and use of responsible contractors when the Minnesota Finance Agency provides financial assistance for development of multiunit residential housing requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Tou Xiong [D] | Sen. Liz Boldon [D] | Sen. Lindsey Port [D] | Sen. Clare Oumou Verbeten [D] |
Sen. Susan Pha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Author added Pha |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Author added Oumou Verbeten |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Labor |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Homelessness Prevention |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4569 (Similar To) 2024-04-26 - Author added Virnig