MN SF4579 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Single-metered utility service in residential buildings regulations and provisions modifications
Title
Single-metered utility service in residential buildings regulations and provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] | Sen. Nicole Mitchell [D] | Sen. Clare Oumou Verbeten [D] |
Sen. Bonnie Westlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - House - House: S.F. NO. 4579 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 82 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 82 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2024-05-17 | Governor approval | |
2024-05-17 | Secretary of State Chapter 107 | |
2024-05-17 | Governor's action Approval | |
2024-05-17 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2024-05-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2024-05-15 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2024-05-15 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2024-05-15 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2024-05-15 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2024-05-15 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Third reading |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2024-04-30 | Senate | House conferees Hollins; Feist; Niska |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate conferees Dibble; Port; Weber |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2024-04-29 | House | House conferees Hollins, Feist, Niska |
2024-04-29 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2024-04-29 | House | Senate conferees Dibble; Port; Weber |
2024-04-29 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2024-04-24 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2024-04-24 | House | Third reading as amended |
2024-04-24 | House | Amended |
2024-04-18 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, April 24, 2024 |
2024-04-15 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-15 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2024-04-11 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF4558 |
2024-04-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Authors added Oumou Verbeten; Westlin |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Author added Mitchell |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Energy, Utilities, Environment, and Climate |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4558 (Similar To) 2024-04-24 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger