MN SF4564 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-17 - Bill passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Coronavirus relief fund appropriation for counties, cities and towns distribution authorization; workers compensation COVID-19 reimbursements and appropriation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coronavirus relief fund appropriation for counties, cities and towns distribution authorization; workers compensation COVID-19 reimbursements and appropriation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Bill passed (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-17SenateBill passed
2020-05-17SenateTaken from table
2020-05-17SenateLaid on table
2020-05-17SenateThird reading
2020-05-17SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2020-05-12SenateSecond reading
2020-05-12SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2020-05-07SenateWithdrawn and re-referred to Finance
2020-05-07SenateAuthor added Nelson
2020-05-06SenateReferred to Taxes
2020-05-06SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF4683 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Author added Boe

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback