MN SF4563 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-13 - Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-13 - Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19 appropriations and transfers to federal funds source modification; general fund appropriations and transfers cancellation; appropriations
Title
COVID-19 appropriations and transfers to federal funds source modification; general fund appropriations and transfers cancellation; appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-13 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2020-05-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4682 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Author added Boe