MN SF455 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Author added Pha
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Author added Pha
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Open meeting from a nonpublic location participation conditions modification
Title
Open meeting from a nonpublic location participation conditions modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Author added Pha |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Author added Jasinski |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF198 (Similar To) 2023-01-23 - Second reading