MN SF445 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution to support the Lake of the Woods water sustainability foundation water quality question
Title
Resolution to support the Lake of the Woods water sustainability foundation water quality question
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Governor's action Approval | |
2010-05-18 | Presentment date | |
2010-05-15 | House: Bill was passed | |
2010-05-15 | House: Third reading | |
2010-05-15 | Senate: Returned from House | |
2010-05-14 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-04-26 | House: Second reading | |
2010-04-26 | House: Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register | |
2010-04-21 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF353 | |
2010-04-21 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-04-15 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-04-12 | Senate: Comm report: To pass | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Rules and Administration | |
2009-02-05 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-02-05 | Senate: Referred to Environment and Natural Resources |