MN SF4410 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - House conferees Liebling; Schultz; Gomez; Pinto; Albright
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - House conferees Liebling; Schultz; Gomez; Pinto; Albright
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus health and human services policy and supplemental appropriations
Title
Omnibus health and human services policy and supplemental appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Karin Housley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 69 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Haley - Amendment - S4410A11 (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 66 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 66 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - S4410A12 (Y: 60 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Kiel - Amendment - S4410A30 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Backer - Amendment - S4410A17 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Rasmusson - Amendment - S4410A14 (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Demuth - Amendment - S4410A22 (Y: 63 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Haley - Amendment - S4410A11 (Y: 63 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 70 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 66 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 66 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Appeal Ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Franson - Amendment - S4410A12 (Y: 60 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Kiel - Amendment - S4410A30 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Backer - Amendment - S4410A17 (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Rasmusson - Amendment - S4410A14 (Y: 62 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Demuth - Amendment - S4410A22 (Y: 63 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Senate | House conferees Liebling; Schultz; Gomez; Pinto; Albright |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate conferees Abeler; Utke; Koran; Benson; Hoffman |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2022-05-04 | House | House conferees Liebling, Schultz, Gomez, Pinto, Albright |
2022-05-04 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate conferees Abeler; Utke; Koran; Benson; Hoffman |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2022-05-03 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2022-05-03 | House | Third reading as amended |
2022-05-03 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken multiple points of order |
2022-05-03 | House | Amended |
2022-04-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 3, 2022 |
2022-04-28 | House | Second reading |
2022-04-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Author added Housley |
2022-04-26 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
2022-04-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Authors added Hoffman; Utke |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4706 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means