MN SF4409 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Author added Osmek
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Author added Osmek
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Energy Conservation and Optimization Act of 2020
Title
Energy Conservation and Optimization Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] |
Sen. David Osmek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Author added Osmek |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Author added Newton |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4502 (Similar To) 2020-05-14 - Author added Bahner