MN SF430 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent enrollment working group establishment
Title
Concurrent enrollment working group establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Comm report: No recommendation, re-referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF703 (Similar To) 2015-02-16 - Author added Knoblach.