MN SF429 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on February 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - Veto message laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on February 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - Veto message laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Attorney fees awards determining factor establishment
Title
Attorney fees awards determining factor establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Newman [R] | Sen. Linda Scheid [D] | Sen. Dave Thompson [R] | Sen. Charles Wiger [D] |
Rep. Pat Mazorol [R] | Rep. Denise Dittrich [D] | Sen. Bev Scalze [D] | Rep. Keith Downey [R] |
Rep. Sandra Peterson [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-01 - House - Passage (Y: 76 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - Amendment (Y: 57 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - Amendment (Y: 56 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - Amendment (Y: 54 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - Amendment (Y: 57 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - Amendment (Y: 58 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - House - Re-Referral (Y: 60 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - Amendment (Y: 57 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - Amendment (Y: 56 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - Amendment (Y: 54 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - Amendment (Y: 57 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - Amendment (Y: 58 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-30 - House - Re-Referral (Y: 60 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | Veto message laid on table | |
2012-02-13 | Governor's action Veto Chapter 120 02/10/12 | |
2012-02-10 | Governor veto | |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Third reading vote: 42-24 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill vote: 43-23 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2012-02-01 | House | Bill was passed vote: 76-49 |
2012-02-01 | House | Third reading |
2012-02-01 | House | Amendments offered |
2012-02-01 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-01-30 | House | Motion did not prevail vote: 60-67 |
2012-01-30 | House | Motion to re-refer Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
2012-01-30 | House | Second reading |
2012-01-30 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2011-05-23 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-22 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-21 | House | Second reading |
2011-05-21 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2011-05-20 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF747 |
2011-05-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 44-21 |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Special Order |
2011-05-14 | Senate | Chief author added Newman |
2011-05-14 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Scheid |
2011-05-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2011-05-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2011-04-28 | Senate | Author added Newman |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |