MN SF4113 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4300
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4300
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus E-12 policy and supplemental appropriations
Title
Omnibus E-12 policy and supplemental appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4300 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4300 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Senate conferees Chamberlain; Coleman; Duckworth; Eichorn; Wiger