MN SF4091 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 80 05/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 80 05/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Act modification; commerce department provisions technical changes
Title
Minnesota Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Act modification; commerce department provisions technical changes
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Koran [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-09 - House - House: Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Secretary of State Chapter 80 05/12/2020 | |
2020-05-15 | Governor's action Approval 05/12/2020 | |
2020-05-12 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-12 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-12 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Returned from House |
2020-05-09 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-09 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-07 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 9, 2020 |
2020-05-05 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-05 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-04 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF4055 |
2020-05-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4055 (Similar To) 2020-05-05 - HF indefinitely postponed