MN SF4075 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revisor's bill
Title
Revisor's bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-20 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-20 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-29 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-29 | Secretary of State Chapter 213 | |
2018-05-29 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-20 | House | Bill was passed vote: 131-0 |
2018-05-20 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-20 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-20 | House | Rules suspended, urgency declared |
2018-05-20 | House | Senate file first reading |
2018-05-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Returned from House |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 66-0 |
2018-05-20 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4489 (Similar To) 2018-05-08 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration