MN SF390 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Reinvest in Fish Hatcheries Citizen-Legislative Advisory Group establishment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reinvest in Fish Hatcheries Citizen-Legislative Advisory Group establishment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance
2019-02-28SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration
2019-02-14SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance
2019-01-22SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2455 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Author added Poston

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback