MN SF389 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alternative fire drills for schools and educational institutions authorization
Title
Alternative fire drills for schools and educational institutions authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Pratt [R] | Sen. Paul T. Anderson [R] | Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] |
Sen. Karin Housley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF431 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Author added Heintzeman