MN SF3888 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-04 - Author added Duckworth
Pending: Senate Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-04 - Author added Duckworth
Pending: Senate Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighters for Healing property acquisition appropriation
Title
Firefighters for Healing property acquisition appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Capital Investment |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3714 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Author added Davids