MN SF366 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF593
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF593
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Real estate appraisers investigations, background checks and disciplinary actions requirements modification
Title
Real estate appraisers investigations, background checks and disciplinary actions requirements modification
Sponsors
Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Bill Weber [R] | Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF593 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Author added Pratt |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Author added Weber |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF593 (Similar To) 2017-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 37 05/11/17