MN SF3638 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Little Alan's Law; carbon monoxide dangers in fish houses awareness increase; snowmobiles, all-terrain vehicles, and motorboats in operation full incorporation into the DWI law establishment
Title
Little Alan's Law; carbon monoxide dangers in fish houses awareness increase; snowmobiles, all-terrain vehicles, and motorboats in operation full incorporation into the DWI law establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-20 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-20 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-20 | Secretary of State Chapter 183 | |
2018-05-20 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-18 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third reading vote: 49-9 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate concurred and repassed bill |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2018-05-16 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 126-0 |
2018-05-16 | House | Third reading as amended |
2018-05-16 | House | Amended |
2018-05-14 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 14, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-09 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with HF3905 |
2018-05-08 | House | Motion prevailed |
2018-05-08 | House | Motion to recall |
2018-05-03 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
2018-05-03 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Author added Bigham |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 59-7 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Author added Draheim |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3923 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Author added Pugh.