MN SF3589 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - House conferees Smith; Albright; Pelowski
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - House conferees Smith; Albright; Pelowski
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
REAL ID Act requirements authorization, implementation, limitation, and appropriation; resident lifetime game and fish license information driver's license or state ID care placement authorization; New Brighton driver's license agent
Title
REAL ID Act requirements authorization, implementation, limitation, and appropriation; resident lifetime game and fish license information driver's license or state ID care placement authorization; New Brighton driver's license agent
Sponsors
Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Susan Kent [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - House - House: Passage (Y: 87 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 100 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 96 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 55 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 74 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 100 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 96 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 55 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 74 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | House conferees Smith; Albright; Pelowski |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate conferees Dibble; Kent; Rosen |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2016-05-18 | House | House conferees Smith, Albright, and Pelowski. |
2016-05-18 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2016-05-18 | House | Senate conferees Dibble, Kent, and Rosen. |
2016-05-18 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2016-05-17 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 87-42 |
2016-05-17 | House | Third reading as amended |
2016-05-17 | House | Amended |
2016-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 17, 2016 |
2016-05-13 | House | Second reading |
2016-05-13 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2016-05-12 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3959 |
2016-05-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 48-16 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03 Suspended adopt previous committee report |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Transportation and Public Safety |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3959 (Similar To) 2016-05-13 - HF indefinitely postponed